Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 273 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 273 Week
» 7078 Month
» 114024 Year
» 1335589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2871
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5048 EARL OF DEVON 31/01/1942
Castle 5088 LLANTHONY ABBEY 24/09/1943
Castle 5066 WARDOUR CASTLE 05/09/1944
Castle 5082 SWORDFISH 13/08/1945
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 02/08/1947
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 11/08/1953
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 08/02/1955
Castle 5079 LYSANDER 20/01/1958