Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 74 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2308 Week
» 23210 Month
» 23210 Year
» 1244775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4012
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7000 VISCOUNT PORTAL 25/05/1946
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 11/09/1953
Castle 7005 LAMPHEY CASTLE 07/04/1955
Castle 7026 TENBY CASTLE 14/01/1957
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 21/11/1958