Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2773
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4087 |
CARDIGAN CASTLE |
26/01/1939 |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
22/11/1940 |
Castle |
5095 |
BARBURY CASTLE |
19/05/1945 |
Castle |
4094 |
DYNEVOR CASTLE |
30/01/1946 |
Castle |
5084 |
READING ABBEY |
10/04/1951 |
Castle |
5084 |
READING ABBEY |
20/03/1952 |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
14/06/1954 |
Castle |
5057 |
EARL WALDEGRAVE |
05/04/1956 |
|