Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 791 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14197 Week
» 67213 Month
» 186740 Year
» 3213593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2685
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5046 |
CLIFFORD CASTLE |
01/04/1936 |
Castle |
4093 |
DUNSTER CASTLE |
05/05/1939 |
Castle |
4087 |
CARDIGAN CASTLE |
25/12/1940 |
Castle |
5060 |
EARL OF BERKELEY |
17/12/1942 |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
13/10/1945 |
Castle |
5019 |
TREAGO CASTLE |
27/06/1946 |
Castle |
5065 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
20/02/1948 |
|