Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 123 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5216 Week
» 7798 Month
» 272431 Year
» 1493996 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4074
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 04/03/1955
Castle 7020 GLOUCESTER CASTLE 04/08/1955
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 24/04/1956
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 05/12/1961