Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 324 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18127 Week
» 71143 Month
» 190670 Year
» 3217523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2881
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5083 |
BATH ABBEY |
31/03/1949 |
Castle |
5089 |
WESTMINSTER ABBEY |
31/03/1949 |
Castle |
5020 |
TREMATON CASTLE |
08/04/1949 |
Castle |
5047 |
EARL OF DARTMOUTH |
12/12/1950 |
Castle |
5013 |
ABERGAVENNY CASTLE |
17/06/1955 |
Castle |
5046 |
EARL CAWDOR |
30/09/1955 |
Castle |
4087 |
CARDIGAN CASTLE |
05/02/1958 |
|