Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 201 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5422 Week
» 20536 Month
» 323726 Year
» 1545291 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4102
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 20/06/1950
Castle 5065 NEWPORT CASTLE 02/05/1952
Castle 5047 EARL OF DARTMOUTH 23/02/1953
Castle 7006 LYDFORD CASTLE 12/07/1958
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 02/05/1960
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 10/10/1961