Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1176 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 2407 Week
» 14112 Month
» 345601 Year
» 422188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2641
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5026 CRICCIETH CASTLE 17/03/1936
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 14/03/1937
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 19/01/1940
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 12/07/1945
Castle 5095 BARBURY CASTLE 14/11/1958