Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 551 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5807 Week
» 24390 Month
» 221907 Year
» 298494 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2727
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 20/05/1939
Castle 5040 STOKESAY CASTLE 21/03/1941
Castle 5063 EARL BALDWIN 31/01/1943
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 16/06/1944
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 26/05/1945
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 06/07/1955
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 03/10/1957
Castle 5021 WHITTINGTON CASTLE 22/03/1958