Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 808 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18611 Week
» 71627 Month
» 191154 Year
» 3218007 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2642
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
17/05/1934 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
17/05/1944 |
Castle |
4088 |
DARTMOUTH CASTLE |
14/06/1947 |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
01/03/1948 |
|