Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4189 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17595 Week
» 70611 Month
» 190138 Year
» 3216991 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2880
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
04/06/1948 |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
02/11/1950 |
Castle |
4099 |
KILGERRAN CASTLE |
11/08/1951 |
Castle |
5049 |
EARL OF PLYMOUTH |
28/12/1951 |
Castle |
7023 |
PENRICE CASTLE |
04/10/1952 |
Castle |
5037 |
MONMOUTH CASTLE |
03/05/1962 |
|