Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1793 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19596 Week
» 72612 Month
» 192139 Year
» 3218992 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2886
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5095 |
BARBURY CASTLE |
08/04/1949 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
06/10/1949 |
Castle |
5018 |
ST MAWES CASTLE |
11/08/1951 |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
01/05/1953 |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
11/07/1953 |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
17/08/1953 |
Castle |
5096 |
BRIDGWATER CASTLE |
18/11/1955 |
Castle |
7036 |
TAUNTON CASTLE |
22/11/1955 |
Castle |
5076 |
GLADIATOR |
10/01/1957 |
Castle |
5042 |
WINCHESTER CASTLE |
19/02/1957 |
|