Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 753 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14159 Week
» 67175 Month
» 186702 Year
» 3213555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2751
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4090 |
DORCHESTER CASTLE |
10/01/1939 |
Castle |
5048 |
EARL OF DEVON |
12/12/1939 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
06/08/1943 |
Castle |
5071 |
SPITFIRE |
05/04/1946 |
Castle |
7000 |
VISCOUNT PORTAL |
15/05/1959 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
27/01/1961 |
|