Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 857 Today
» 1285 Yesterday
» 3379 Week
» 31770 Month
» 157247 Year
» 233834 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2557
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 17/10/1933
Castle 4094 DYNEVOR CASTLE 02/10/1940
Castle 5096 BRIDGWATER CASTLE 09/01/1942
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 22/10/1943
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 21/12/1945
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 16/05/1947
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 29/01/1949
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 02/03/1962