Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3582 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16988 Week
» 70004 Month
» 189531 Year
» 3216384 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2898
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4090 |
DORCHESTER CASTLE |
20/12/1949 |
Castle |
5022 |
WIGMORE CASTLE |
20/02/1952 |
Castle |
5081 |
LOCKHEED HUDSON |
29/04/1953 |
Castle |
5051 |
EARL BATHURST |
23/10/1953 |
|