Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 575 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3718 Week
» 13888 Month
» 291684 Year
» 1176065 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2586
Type Collett 8 wheeled 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 49t 8cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 09/1931
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 10/1931
Castle 5032 USK CASTLE 27/07/1935
Castle 5071 CLIFFORD CASTLE 07/06/1940
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 21/04/1942
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 23/06/1944
Castle 5068 BEVERSTON CASTLE 16/04/1948