Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1916 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15322 Week
» 68338 Month
» 187865 Year
» 3214718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2619
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5023 |
BRECON CASTLE |
19/02/1938 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
16/09/1939 |
Castle |
5002 |
LUDLOW CASTLE |
26/01/1949 |
Castle |
5020 |
TREMATON CASTLE |
05/04/1960 |
|