Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 131 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 14432 Month
» 292228 Year
» 1176609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2843
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 21/08/1940
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 28/10/1941
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 26/08/1942
Castle 100A1 LLOYD'S 05/04/1943
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 01/12/1944
Castle 7018 DRYSLLWYN CASTLE 30/06/1953
Castle 5060 EARL OF BERKELEY 26/08/1959
Castle 5065 NEWPORT CASTLE 22/04/1961
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 07/10/1961
Castle 7028 CADBURY CASTLE 31/10/1961