Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 687 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18490 Week
» 71506 Month
» 191033 Year
» 3217886 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2934
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5005 |
MANORBIER CASTLE |
02/08/1949 |
Castle |
5054 |
EARL OF DUCIE |
03/04/1951 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
01/01/1952 |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
20/08/1952 |
Castle |
5045 |
EARL OF DUDLEY |
30/12/1955 |
Castle |
5014 |
GOODRICH CASTLE |
11/10/1957 |
Castle |
7029 |
CLUN CASTLE |
02/07/1962 |
Castle |
7032 |
DENBIGH CASTLE |
05/12/1962 |
|