Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4298 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17704 Week
» 70720 Month
» 190247 Year
» 3217100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4072
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5098 |
CLIFFORD CASTLE |
05/01/1951 |
Castle |
5057 |
EARL WALDEGRAVE |
30/04/1952 |
Castle |
7011 |
BANBURY CASTLE |
12/08/1952 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
02/12/1952 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
16/01/1953 |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
15/09/1953 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
04/06/1954 |
Castle |
7004 |
EASTNOR CASTLE |
04/01/1955 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
25/05/1956 |
Castle |
7009 |
ATHELNEY CASTLE |
07/01/1958 |
|