Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2264 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15670 Week
» 68686 Month
» 188213 Year
» 3215066 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2650
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4092 |
DUNRAVEN CASTLE |
21/02/1936 |
Star |
4067 |
TINTERN ABBEY |
11/1940 |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
06/02/1943 |
Castle |
5045 |
EARL OF DUDLEY |
01/06/1945 |
Castle |
4098 |
KIDWELLY CASTLE |
27/01/1951 |
Castle |
7020 |
GLOUCESTER CASTLE |
05/06/1951 |
Castle |
7037 |
SWINDON |
12/11/1952 |
Castle |
5034 |
CORFE CASTLE |
29/04/1954 |
|