Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2744
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 21/12/1943
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 10/08/1944
Castle 5016 MONTGOMERY CASTLE 23/06/1950
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 28/05/1952
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 02/04/1954
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 22/01/1958
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 25/03/1961
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 06/10/1962
Castle 7009 ATHELNEY CASTLE 13/07/1963