Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1093 Week
» 3675 Month
» 268308 Year
» 1489873 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2883
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 30/04/1954
Castle 5056 EARL OF POWIS 26/03/1955
Castle 5014 GOODRICH CASTLE 27/06/1955
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 20/01/1956
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 08/10/1957
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 21/07/1962