Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 321 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 321 Week
» 7126 Month
» 114072 Year
» 1335637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2655
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5034 CORFE CASTLE 28/07/1937
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 07/01/1941
Castle 5082 SWORDFISH 11/11/1943
Castle 5046 EARL CAWDOR 14/06/1949
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 10/12/1957
Castle 5004 LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE 01/08/1958