Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 57 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 3878 Week
» 21214 Month
» 299010 Year
» 1183391 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2601
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5021 WHITTINGTON CASTLE 27/11/1933
Castle 4094 DYNEVOR CASTLE 17/11/1934
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 21/10/1936
Castle 5021 WHITTINGTON CASTLE 08/09/1945
Castle 7032 DENBIGH CASTLE 10/08/1953
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 04/05/1954
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 27/05/1954
Castle 7028 CADBURY CASTLE 01/01/1955
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 13/08/1955
Castle 5017 THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT 28TH 61ST 29/09/1955
Castle 5018 ST MAWES CASTLE 01/07/1956
Castle 7022 HEREFORD CASTLE 02/11/1957