Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 278 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 278 Week
» 7083 Month
» 114029 Year
» 1335594 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2560
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 11/07/1935
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 25/09/1935
Castle 4094 DYNEVOR CASTLE 05/05/1939
Castle 111 VISCOUNT CHURCHILL 24/09/1940
Castle 7003 ELMLEY CASTLE 25/05/1948