Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 385 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 385 Week
» 7190 Month
» 114136 Year
» 1335701 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2740
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 10/10/1942
Castle 5026 CRICCIETH CASTLE 07/03/1943
Castle 4094 DYNEVOR CASTLE 14/08/1944
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 01/01/1955
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 27/03/1958
Castle 5034 CORFE CASTLE 10/02/1961