Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 409 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 409 Week
» 7214 Month
» 114160 Year
» 1335725 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2790
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 28/08/1939
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 29/03/1940
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 22/09/1948
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 19/12/1949
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 15/07/1950
Castle 5088 LLANTHONY ABBEY 03/08/1950
Castle 5098 CLIFFORD CASTLE 04/12/1961