Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 1208 Yesterday
» 1322 Week
» 25283 Month
» 188337 Year
» 264924 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2731
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 05/08/1941
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 18/09/1941
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 15/11/1944
Castle 5054 EARL OF DUCIE 07/03/1947
Castle 5021 WHITTINGTON CASTLE 22/08/1957
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 20/03/1958
Castle 7012 BARRY CASTLE 22/03/1958
Castle 7003 ELMLEY CASTLE 07/06/1960
Castle 7000 VISCOUNT PORTAL 10/1961
Castle 7025 SUDELEY CASTLE 27/02/1963
Castle 7027 THORNBURY CASTLE 28/05/1963
Castle 5022 WIGMORE CASTLE 13/07/1963