Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 609 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6214 Week
» 17761 Month
» 417443 Year
» 494030 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2401
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5067 ST FAGANS CASTLE 23/01/1945
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 24/05/1945
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 16/10/1947
Castle 5048 EARL OF DEVON 16/07/1949