Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2783
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5081 |
PENRICE CASTLE |
27/05/1939 |
Castle |
5065 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
05/10/1943 |
Castle |
100A1 |
LLOYD'S |
04/08/1945 |
Castle |
5052 |
EARL OF RADNOR |
15/01/1957 |
|