Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1509 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19312 Week
» 72328 Month
» 191855 Year
» 3218708 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2839
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4016 |
THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) |
11/07/1940 |
Castle |
111 |
VISCOUNT CHURCHILL |
05/03/1948 |
Castle |
5035 |
COITY CASTLE |
08/10/1949 |
Castle |
5083 |
BATH ABBEY |
13/12/1949 |
Castle |
5067 |
ST FAGANS CASTLE |
20/06/1958 |
|