Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 95 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5188 Week
» 7770 Month
» 272403 Year
» 1493968 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2734
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 28/01/1938
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 08/05/1941
Castle 5079 LYSANDER 07/10/1948
Castle 7014 CAERHAYS CASTLE 05/05/1961
Castle 7019 FOWEY CASTLE 01/1963