Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 500 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1839 Week
» 31337 Month
» 368183 Year
» 1589748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2746
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5073 CRANBROOK CASTLE 07/07/1938
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 27/10/1941
Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE 05/02/1942
Castle 7004 EASTNOR CASTLE 19/06/1956