Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 466 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1805 Week
» 31303 Month
» 368149 Year
» 1589714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2799
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 11/10/1939
Castle 5083 BATH ABBEY 03/06/1941
Castle 5020 TREMATON CASTLE 08/09/1943
Castle 5036 LYONSHALL CASTLE 23/09/1944
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 05/12/1945
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 22/10/1958