Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 440 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1779 Week
» 31277 Month
» 368123 Year
» 1589688 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2554
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5060 EARL OF BERKELEY 15/04/1941
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 28/11/1942
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 17/09/1947
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 01/03/1950
Castle 5036 LYONSHALL CASTLE 15/03/1951
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 10/04/1952
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 14/01/1959