Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 336 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 336 Week
» 7141 Month
» 114087 Year
» 1335652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4099
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 03/02/1954
Castle 4037 THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS 01/03/1954
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 10/09/1955
Castle 5057 EARL WALDEGRAVE 24/03/1960