Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 74 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2308 Week
» 23210 Month
» 23210 Year
» 1244775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2440
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 04/09/1929
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 17/06/1939
Castle 5075 DEVIZES CASTLE 08/02/1940
Castle 5079 LYSANDER 01/11/1940
Castle 5026 CRICCIETH CASTLE 14/12/1945
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 13/02/1947
Castle 5069 ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL 30/09/1947
Castle 5015 KINGSWEAR CASTLE 16/06/1956