Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1507 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14913 Week
» 67929 Month
» 187456 Year
» 3214309 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2394
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5002 |
LUDLOW CASTLE |
03/06/1939 |
Castle |
5052 |
EARL OF RADNOR |
23/08/1944 |
Castle |
5014 |
GOODRICH CASTLE |
22/04/1947 |
Castle |
5031 |
TOTNES CASTLE |
08/08/1961 |
|