Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4057
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7002 |
DEVIZES CASTLE |
02/1950 |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
03/05/1950 |
Castle |
5002 |
LUDLOW CASTLE |
26/10/1951 |
Castle |
5073 |
BLENHEIM |
07/09/1953 |
Castle |
5069 |
ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL |
24/08/1955 |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
01/04/1960 |
|