Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 583 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19494 Week
» 84448 Month
» 287112 Year
» 3313965 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4100
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7029 |
CLUN CASTLE |
25/05/1950 |
Castle |
7021 |
HAVERFORDWEST CASTLE |
23/08/1954 |
Castle |
5002 |
LUDLOW CASTLE |
25/02/1956 |
Castle |
5066 |
SIR FELIX POLE |
21/08/1957 |
Castle |
5025 |
CHIRK CASTLE |
10/02/1959 |
|