Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1392 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14798 Week
» 67814 Month
» 187341 Year
» 3214194 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2816
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
13/03/1940 |
Castle |
5051 |
EARL BATHURST |
08/06/1945 |
Castle |
5005 |
MANORBIER CASTLE |
04/06/1947 |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
29/03/1950 |
|