Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 423 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 423 Week
» 7228 Month
» 114174 Year
» 1335739 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4008
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5023 BRECON CASTLE 24/12/1946
Castle 5010 RESTORMEL CASTLE 11/06/1948
Castle 5015 KINGSWEAR CASTLE 02/05/1950
Castle 7027 THORNBURY CASTLE 17/10/1951
Castle 5076 GLADIATOR 27/02/1953
Castle 5093 UPTON CASTLE 26/06/1953