Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 791 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24422 Week
» 89376 Month
» 292040 Year
» 3318893 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2530
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5027 |
FARLEIGH CASTLE |
28/03/1936 |
Castle |
5014 |
GOODRICH CASTLE |
28/09/1936 |
Castle |
5005 |
MANORBIER CASTLE |
20/02/1942 |
Castle |
5067 |
ST FAGANS CASTLE |
30/01/1943 |
Castle |
4087 |
CARDIGAN CASTLE |
02/12/1944 |
Castle |
5084 |
READING ABBEY |
21/12/1944 |
Castle |
5082 |
SWORDFISH |
21/04/1945 |
|