Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 343 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 343 Week
» 7148 Month
» 114094 Year
» 1335659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4054
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 19/05/1950
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 30/01/1951
Castle 7037 SWINDON 02/10/1951
Castle 5071 SPITFIRE 08/03/1961