Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 342 Today
» 1219 Yesterday
» 2852 Week
» 34641 Month
» 183406 Year
» 1404971 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4040
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 05/01/1954
Castle 5036 LYONSHALL CASTLE 04/09/1957
Castle 5066 SIR FELIX POLE 21/05/1960
Castle 5093 UPTON CASTLE 13/08/1960