Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 1208 Yesterday
» 1322 Week
» 25283 Month
» 188337 Year
» 264924 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2848
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5089 WESTMINSTER ABBEY 30/05/1947
Castle 5032 USK CASTLE 01/05/1951
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 26/01/1955
Castle 5017 THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT 28TH 61ST 06/03/1957
Castle 5097 SARUM CASTLE 14/07/1961