Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 2394 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15800 Week
» 68816 Month
» 188343 Year
» 3215196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2625
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5022 |
WIGMORE CASTLE |
05/04/1935 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
20/07/1945 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
02/07/1946 |
Castle |
5061 |
EARL OF BIRKENHEAD |
14/06/1958 |
Castle |
5018 |
ST MAWES CASTLE |
03/1964 |
|