Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2912 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16318 Week
» 69334 Month
» 188861 Year
» 3215714 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4059
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7016 |
CHESTER CASTLE |
10/08/1948 |
Castle |
5020 |
TREMATON CASTLE |
14/12/1950 |
Castle |
5019 |
TREAGO CASTLE |
08/06/1951 |
Castle |
5046 |
EARL CAWDOR |
19/02/1953 |
Castle |
7015 |
CARN BREA CASTLE |
13/09/1955 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
16/11/1956 |
Castle |
5034 |
CORFE CASTLE |
07/08/1957 |
|