Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 551 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5807 Week
» 24390 Month
» 221907 Year
» 298494 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2552
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE 10/10/1942
Castle 5092 TRESCO ABBEY 26/04/1944
Castle 5088 LLANTHONY ABBEY 29/09/1944
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 14/03/1945
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 10/10/1947